MA H3859 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4403

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Boston be authorized to offer early voting in municipal elections. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the City of Boston to offer early voting in municipal elections

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4403
2019-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-06-12SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-06HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H3696 (Similar To) 2020-03-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3860 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3748 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4103 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4195
H864 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H863 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H2767 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1483 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H741 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback