MA H3860 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4403

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to election procedures in the city of Boston. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to election procedures in the City of Boston

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4403
2019-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-06-12SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-06HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H3696 (Similar To) 2020-03-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3936 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H864 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H863 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H2767 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback