RI S2801 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- RESIDENTIAL SOLAR ENERGY DISCLOSURE AND HOMEOWNERS BILL OF RIGHTS ACT - Repeals the "Residential Solar Energy Disclosure and Homeowners Bill of Rights Act." Amends title 5 "Businesses and Professions" to include a new chapter 93, an amended "Residential Solar Energy Disclosure and Homeowners Bill of Rights Act."
Title
Repeals the "Residential Solar Energy Disclosure and Homeowners Bill of Rights Act." Amends title 5 "Businesses and Professions" to include a new chapter 93, an amended "Residential Solar Energy Disclosure and Homeowners Bill of Rights Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Indefinite postponement (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Indefinite postponement (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-04 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2024) |
2024-05-08 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2024) |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Subjects
Public Utilities And Carriers
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- RESIDENTIAL SOLAR ENERGY DISCLOSURE AND HOMEOWNERS BILL OF RIGHTS ACT
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- RESIDENTIAL SOLAR ENERGY DISCLOSURE AND HOMEOWNERS BILL OF RIGHTS ACT