NH SB430 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - II. Remainder Effective 06/14/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to establishing a council to study the impacts of electric vehicles, e-mobility devices, and the associated lithium-ion batteries on first responder response, the environment, building and fire codes, life safety, and property protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to establishing a council to study the impacts of electric vehicles, e-mobility devices, and the associated lithium-ion batteries on first responder response, the environment, building and fire codes, life safety, and property protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-20SenateII. Remainder Effective 06/14/2024
2024-06-20SenateI. Section 2 Effective 11/01/2025
2024-06-20SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/14/2024; Chapter 0085
2024-05-30HouseEnrolled 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 10
2024-05-30SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/23/2024); Senate Journal 15
2024-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 13
2024-04-19HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass 04/10/2024 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 10
2024-04-19HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2024-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2024-02-29HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 6 P. 139
2024-02-08SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2024-0362s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3
2024-02-08SenateCommittee Amendment # 2024-0362s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3
2024-01-31SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0362s, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6
2024-01-10SenateHearing: 01/16/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3
2023-12-12SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback