MA S2320 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the Boston Residents Job Policy. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Boston Residents Job Policy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-12JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-08-12HouseHouse concurred
2019-08-08SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
2019-08-08SenateRules suspended
2019-05-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3859 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3860 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4103 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4195
H863 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
S1364 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1483 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback