MA H2827 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the availability of private utility construction contracts. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-15 | House | Accompanied by S1989 |
2019-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2827 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2827.pdf |