MA S1483 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to concern health insurance benefits for surviving spouses of firefighters in the city of Boston. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning health insurance benefits for surviving spouses of firefighters in the city of Boston

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseRead; and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-09-16SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-09-16SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-06-27SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-05-06SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-04-02JointHearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H726 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2962 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H729 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1241 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3054 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2290 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H863 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H2502 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1484 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H741 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3748 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Senate concurred
H3859 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Senate concurred
H3860 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Senate concurred
S2320 (Similar To) 2019-08-12 - House concurred
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback