MA S1484 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to survivor retirement benefits. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to survivor retirement benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1241 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3054 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2210 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2359 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2229 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
H2290 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2502 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1483 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback