MA S2338 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S2349

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SENATE, September 16, 2019 - The committee on Ways and Means to whom was referred the Senate Bill to protect children, families, and firefighters from harmful flame retardants (Senate, No. 1230),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2338).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect children, families, and firefighters from harmful flame retardants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-19 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #94 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenatePassed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
2019-09-19SenateReprinted as amended, see S2349
2019-09-19SenateRead third
2019-09-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-09-19SenateSubstituted as a new draft for S1230
2019-09-19SenateAmendment #4 (Rodrigues) adopted
2019-09-19SenateAmendment #3 (Tarr) adopted
2019-09-19SenateAmendment #2 (Tarr) rejected
2019-09-19SenateAmendment #1 (deMacedo) rejected - see Roll Call #93 [YEAS 2 - NAYS 36]
2019-09-16SenateRecommended new draft for S1230
2019-09-16SenateReported form the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4006 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2349 (Replaces) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4104 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback