MA H4083 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4163

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-3)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reports required to be filed by the Department of Children and Families. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to DCF legislative reporting reform

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-04HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4163
2019-09-24JointHearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 03:00 PM-04:30 PM in A-2
2019-09-19SenateSenate concurred
2019-09-09HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
2019-09-03HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H151 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2344 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S39 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
H4163 (Replaced by) 2019-11-14 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback