MA H3696 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to certain affordable housing in the South End section of the city of Boston. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain affordable housing in the South End section of the city of Boston

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-07-11SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-07-11SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2019-06-20SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-06-19HouseRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third, rules suspended and passed to be engrossed
2019-06-19HouseRules suspended
2019-06-19HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass
2019-06-05HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-05-02JointHearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-04-29SenateSenate concurred
2019-04-25HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H864 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H863 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H741 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3748 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H3859 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3860 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2320 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4103 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4195
S804 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2421 (Similar To) 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback