CA SB1508 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 454.52 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: integrated resource plans: energy storage systems: modeling.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1508 Stern (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1508 Stern (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4144.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3986.) (May 16). |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3. Page 3702.) (April 22). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 454.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |