MA H4161 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to allow certain 17 year-old pre-registered voters to vote in primary elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to youth voter engagement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-01-16JointHearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-10-30SenateSenate concurred
2019-10-28HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws
2019-10-21HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S406 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H653 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S414 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H2445 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S424 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback