MA S406 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2544

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote access to democracy in Massachusetts. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting access to democracy in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2544
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S385 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S396 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H636 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H715 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H685 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback