MA S2440 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to local housing authority board member elections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to local housing authority board member elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-23HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-12-19SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-12-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-12-19SenateSubstituted for S777
2019-12-19SenateRecommended new draft (Boncore) for S777

Same As/Similar To

H20 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1257 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - House concurred
S777 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - New draft (Boncore) substituted, see S2440
H1291 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2383 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Hearing scheduled for 01/29/2020 from 03:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback