MA H1291 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to elections of local housing authority board members. Housing.
Title
Relative to local housing authority board member elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S406 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H653 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2445 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1302 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
S414 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3860 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
H3936 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2290 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2020
S424 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H653 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2445 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1302 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
S414 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3860 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
H3936 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2290 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2020
S424 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1291 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1291.pdf |