MA S2290 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2544

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for recall elections in the town of East Bridgewater. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for recall elections in the town of East Bridgewater

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2020-02-24SenateRecommitted to the committee on Election Laws
2020-02-24SenateDischarged (in part) from S2544
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2544
2020-01-16JointHearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-07-12HouseHouse concurred
2019-07-11SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
S416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S426 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H665 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S423 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4065 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3158 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback