MA S426 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to early voting ballots. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to early voting ballots
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2544 |
2019-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S386 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H684 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S382 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H661 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S397 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H665 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S416 (Similar To) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S2632
H681 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H691 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2290 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
H684 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S382 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H661 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S397 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H665 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S416 (Similar To) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S2632
H681 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H691 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2290 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S426 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S426.pdf |