CA AB3227 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21080.61 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: stormwater facilities: routine maintenance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3227 Alvarez By Atkins Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 3227 Alvarez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 3227 Alvarez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.). |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P., & W. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.61 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |