MA S382 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2544

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to early voting in municipal elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to early voting in municipal elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2544
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H684 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H707 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S397 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S420 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H692 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H635 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S426 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H681 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S387 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H691 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback