MA H719 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the use of ranked choice voting in certain elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to ranked choice voting

Sponsors

Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]
Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H1302 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H656 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H653 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S420 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S428 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H635 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S406 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3936 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback