MA S1876 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2701
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Accompanied H2701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Accompanied H2701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a commission on transparency and use of artificial intelligence in government decision-making. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing a commission on transparency and use of artificial intelligence in government decision-making
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | House | Accompanied H2701 |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H876 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1828 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1201 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - New draft substituted, see S2252
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1432 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2252 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3687 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
S2302 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Reported on the residue by S2744
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H4179 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H2701 (Replaced by) 2020-05-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1828 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1201 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - New draft substituted, see S2252
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1432 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2252 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3687 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
S2302 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Reported on the residue by S2744
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H4179 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H2701 (Replaced by) 2020-05-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1876 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1876.pdf |