MA H3687 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4039
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to financing the general governmental infrastructure of the Commonwealth (House, No. 3687). April 16th 2019.
Title
Financing the general governmental infrastructure of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4039 |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1432 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1828 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1201 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - New draft substituted, see S2252
H121 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1873 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2252 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2302 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Reported on the residue by S2744
H4039 (Replaced by) 2020-05-13 - New draft substituted, see H4708
S1828 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1201 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - New draft substituted, see S2252
H121 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1873 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2252 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2302 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Reported on the residue by S2744
H4039 (Replaced by) 2020-05-13 - New draft substituted, see H4708
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3687 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3687.pdf |