MA S1828 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a behavioral science insights policy directive. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to government efficiency
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H6 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H724 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H2889 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1876 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied H2701
S1201 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - New draft substituted, see S2252
S1432 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1873 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H121 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2252 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3687 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S2302 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Reported on the residue by S2744
S1986 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2478
H1363 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2417 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2019
H6 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H724 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H2889 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1876 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied H2701
S1201 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - New draft substituted, see S2252
S1432 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1873 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H121 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2252 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3687 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S2302 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Reported on the residue by S2744
S1986 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2478
H1363 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2417 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1828 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1828.pdf |