MA H566 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4433

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 78-13)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4433
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to requiring instruction on the Holocaust and genocide in public schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning genocide education

Sponsors

Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Sheila Harrington [R]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]
Sen. Michael Moore [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Rep. David Decoste [R]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]
Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4433
2019-09-27JointHearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H476 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H558 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
H557 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
H524 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1827 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S762 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Senate concurred
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H3911 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4041 (Similar To) 2020-07-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-01-17 - Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4433 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback