MA S761 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4075
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to transparency in higher education. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to transparency in higher education
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4075 |
2019-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S762 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
H1217 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S953 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4075 (Replaced by) 2019-10-02 - New draft substituted, see H4099
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H1217 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S953 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4075 (Replaced by) 2019-10-02 - New draft substituted, see H4099
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S761 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S761.pdf |