MA H3921 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electioneering communication expenditures. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to honest online political advertisement disclosure and election interference
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3860 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
S406 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3936 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2290 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2020
H653 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S414 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2445 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S424 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3860 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
S406 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3936 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2290 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2020
H653 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S414 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2445 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S424 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3921 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3921.pdf |