MA S697 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a right to representation for college students in some school disciplinary matters. Higher Education.
Title
Creating a right to representation for college students in some school disciplinary matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2081 |
2017-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S702 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S694 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S704 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S667 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S694 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S704 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S667 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S697 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S697.pdf |