MA S667 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2274

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure students' access to academic transcripts. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring students' access to academic transcripts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2274
2017-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S702 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S694 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H964 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H765 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2274 (Replaced by) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback