MA H765 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4874

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to audio recordings and written transcripts of phone calls made to the 911 emergency system. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect the privacy of 911 callers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4874
2017-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S991 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2320
S886 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S116 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S885 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
S1936 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H3698 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2053 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback