MA S116 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect the privacy of consumer financial information. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting the privacy of consumer financial information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-09-21JointHearing scheduled for 09/25/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-2
2017-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-06-19HouseHouse concurred
2017-06-15SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S127 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S143 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2357
S1845 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H519 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2164 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H556 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H3584 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2357 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2610 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback