MA S2610 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, July 16, 2018 - The committee on Ways and Means to whom was referred the Senate Bill to protect consumers by prohibiting blocking, throttling, or paid prioritization in the provision of internet service (Senate, No. 2336) (also based on Senate, No. 2376),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft entitled “An Act promoting net neutrality and consumer protection” (Senate, No. 2610).
Title
Promoting net neutrality and consumer protection
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-19 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #459 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #459 (yeas 37 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read third |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S2336 |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Eldridge) rejected |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Humason) adopted |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tarr) adopted |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Recommended new text for S2336 |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2610 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2610.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/190/SenateRollCall459.pdf |