MA S314 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2428
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to ensuring the integrity of charter schools. Education.
Title
Ensuring charter school integrity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2428 |
2017-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 428 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S298 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S281 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S282 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1345 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H259 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2428 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S281 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S282 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1345 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H259 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2428 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S314 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S314.pdf |