MA S2336 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S2376
Note: Legislation replaced by S2610

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect consumers by prohibiting blocking, throttling, or paid prioritization in the provision of internet service. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting consumers by prohibiting blocking, throttling, or paid prioritization in the provision of internet service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-19SenateNew draft substituted, see S2610
2018-07-19SenateRead second
2018-07-17SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 19th
2018-07-17SenateReferred to the committee on Senate Rules
2018-07-17SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2610
2018-07-17SenateAccompanied by S2376
2018-04-17SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-04-17SenateReport amended by substitution of bill
2018-04-17SenateRules suspended
2018-04-17SenateOught NOT to pass (under JR10)
2018-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/03/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2018-03-22SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-21HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 12, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-09HouseHouse concurred
2018-01-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
2018-01-29SenateRules suspended
2017-12-21SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2357 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H4517 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Published as amended, see H4539
H4539 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported by H4670
S2376 (Replaces) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied S2336
S2610 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback