MA H4151 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4684

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-2)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to assure net neutrality by Internet service providers and the equal treatment of data on the Internet, and to prohibit discrimination or charge disparity of user, content, website, platform, application, type of attached equipment or method of communication. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting consumers by prohibiting blocking, throttling, or paid prioritization in the provision of Internet service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4684
2018-05-09SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-07HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 21, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-17HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 26, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/03/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2018-03-22SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-21HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 12, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-12JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2018-03-06JointHearing scheduled for 03/13/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2018-03-01SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-26HouseReporting date extended to Thursday March 15, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-01-25SenateSenate concurred
2018-01-22HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
2017-12-28HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S2062 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H3698 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2053 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
S179 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
H3331 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2254 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4684 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2610 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback