MA H3698 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4651

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-8)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the disclosure of customer proprietary information by internet service providers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to internet privacy

Sponsors

Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. James Cantwell [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Cory Atkins [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. James Miceli [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Stephen Kulik [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Kevin Kuros [R]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]Sen. John Velis [D]
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. James Dwyer [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Robert Koczera [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Peter Durant [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4651
2017-06-08JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-05-11SenateSenate concurred
2017-05-04HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
2017-04-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S149 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1367 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S2001 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1718 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1363 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H303 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
S2091 (Similar To) 2017-06-21 - See H3731
S2269 (Similar To) 2018-10-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2018
H4651 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4812 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback