MA S149 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the security of personal financial information. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the security of personal financial information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S116 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S32 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S973 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1522 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2053 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H2341 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H376 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H882 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2210 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - See H4009
S2292 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4241 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
S2552 (Replaced by) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4806 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 444 of the Acts of 2018
H4851 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
S32 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S973 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1522 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2053 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H2341 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H376 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H882 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2210 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - See H4009
S2292 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4241 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
S2552 (Replaced by) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4806 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 444 of the Acts of 2018
H4851 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S149 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S149.pdf |