MA H4806 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4241
Note: Legislation replaced by H4873
Note: Legislation replaced by H4873
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 444 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 444 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendments of the House Bill removing fees for security freezes and disclosures of consumer credit reports (House, No. 4241), reports recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 4806).
Title
Relative to consumer protection from security breaches
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-25 - House - House On Acceptance of the conference report Yea and Nay No. 414 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence Roll Call #466 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence Roll Call #466 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 444 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Re-enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Re-enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the still further House amendment |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a still further amendment |
2018-12-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Further amendment (Lovely) adopted |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Governor's amendment adopted, as amended by the House |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-11-29 | House | Further amendments adopted, thus precluding a vote on the Governor's amendments |
2018-11-29 | House | Governors amendment considered (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading) |
2018-08-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-08-06 | House | For message, see H4873 |
2018-08-03 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-25 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence -see Roll Call #466 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-25 | House | Committee of conference report accepted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 414) |
2018-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-24 | House | Reported on H4241 |
2018-07-24 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H4241 (Replaced by) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
H134 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4232 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Published as amended, see H4241
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4873 (Replaced by) 2018-08-06 - See H4806
H134 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4232 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Published as amended, see H4241
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4873 (Replaced by) 2018-08-06 - See H4806