MA H4241 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-24 - Reported by H4806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House bill No. 4232, as changed by the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing fees for security freezes and disclosures of consumer credit reports

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #360 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-24HouseReported by H4806
2018-05-03SenateCommittee of conference appointed, in concurrence (L'Italien-Keenan-Fattman)
2018-05-03SenateSenate insisted on its amendment
2018-05-03SenateRules suspended
2018-05-03HouseCommittee of conference appointed - (Chan-D. Hunt-R. Hunt)
2018-05-03HouseHouse NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
2018-05-03HouseRules suspended
2018-04-26SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #360 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0)
2018-04-26SenateReprinted, as amended, see S2492
2018-04-26SenateRead third
2018-04-26SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-04-26SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2455, amended
2018-04-26SenateAmendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
2018-04-26SenateRead second
2018-04-19SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 26, 2018
2018-04-19SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2018-04-19SenateAccompanied by S2304
2018-04-19SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2455
2018-02-15SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-02-14HouseH4232, published as amended

Same As/Similar To

H4232 (Replaces) 2018-02-14 - Published as amended, see H4241
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H134 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
S2304 (Replaces) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H4241
S2492 (Replaced by) 2018-04-26 - See H4241
H4806 (Replaces) 2018-08-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4851 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback