MA S32 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2345
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve the children's medical security program and simplifying the administration process. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Improving the children's medical security program and simplifying the administration process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2345 |
2017-06-27 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S289 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2259
S41 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S59 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S28 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S297 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4127
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1175 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2555
S547 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2643
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S40 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H796 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2274 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2345 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S41 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S59 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S28 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S297 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4127
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1175 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2555
S547 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2643
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S40 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H796 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2274 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2345 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S32 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S32.pdf |