MA S2070 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S232
Note: Legislation has been replaced by H3740

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to language opportunity for our kids,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2070).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For language opportunity for our kids

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20SenateAccompanied H3740
2017-05-18SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-05-18SenateNew draft of S232
2017-05-18SenateReported from the committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S232 (Replaces) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2070
H3740 (Replaced by) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3736 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Published as amended, see H3740
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H926 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3705 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - New draft substituted, see H3736
H3944 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4032 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Enacted and laid before the Governor

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback