MA H2216 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4528

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for primary and preventative health care services for certain children. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving the children's medical security program and simplifying the administrative process

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4528
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-04-18JointHearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S600 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S289 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2259
S551 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S40 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2468 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2343 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H796 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H109 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H981 (Similar To) 2017-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H934 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H881 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H984 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3822 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2017
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4528 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Reported, in part, by H1188
H4639 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Committee of conference appointed (Welch-Lewis-Tarr), in concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback