MA S609 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to order a study on disparities in health care arising out of a change in marital status. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To study disparities in health care resulting from changes in marital status

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-06-05JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S227 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S185 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S265 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2256
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S1141 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2559 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback