MA S1413 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2491

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the effects of the Windfall Elimination Provision and Government Pension Offset in Massachusetts. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the effects of the Windfall Elimination Provision and Government Pension Offset in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2491
2017-10-04JointHearing scheduled for 10/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S227 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S185 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S265 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2256
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback