MA S276 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2258
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to call for a comprehensive study of vocational education in the Commonwealth. Education.
Title
Calling for a comprehensive study of vocational education in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2258 |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S227 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S185 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S265 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2256
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1007 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Replaced by) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2292 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S185 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S265 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2256
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1007 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Replaced by) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2292 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S276 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S276.pdf |