MA H2274 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4701

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-15)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to guidelines for guardians of minor children. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote the well-being of minor children living with guardians

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4701
2018-05-03SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday June 6, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-04-19SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-21HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday March 21, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2066 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H887 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1217 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
S1177 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
H1180 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H115 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H754 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H803 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4701 (Replaced by) 2018-07-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback