MA S1367 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2535
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts Emergency Information Program. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to emergency first responder notification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2535 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1299 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H659 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
H659 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1367 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1367.pdf |