MA H4684 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy to make an investigation and study of certain House documents concerning telecommunications, utilities and energy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications, Utilities, & Energy Bills

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2018-07-16HouseOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules
2018-07-16HouseAccompanied by H1739, H1746, H1748, H1751, H2700, H2706, H2709, H3396, H3634, H4149, H4151 and H4222
2018-07-16HouseReported from the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H1739 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H1746 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H1748 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H1751 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H2700 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H2706 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H2709 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H3396 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H3634 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H4149 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H4151 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H4222 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2498 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4537 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4706 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4685 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4740 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4678 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4591 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4625 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback