MA H3634 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4684

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to renewable energy portfolio standards for retail electricity suppliers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accelerating the renewable energy portfolio standard

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4684
2018-05-09SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-07HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 21, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-17HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 26, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-15SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-12HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 12, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 9, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1841 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2503
H4684 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback