MA H4149 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4684

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Haverhill be authorized to assess fines for failure to relocate or remove utility poles and wires. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Haverhill to assess fines for failure to relocate or remove utility poles and wires

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4684
2018-05-09SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-07HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 21, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-17HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 26, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/03/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2018-03-22SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-21HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 12, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-12JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2018-03-06JointHearing scheduled for 03/13/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2018-03-01SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-26HouseReporting date extended to Thursday March 15, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-01-29SenateSenate concurred
2018-01-25HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H3646 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3937
H1749 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1780 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2702 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H4025 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2018
H4186 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2018
H4684 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback